About

Is a system of mental calculation developed by Jagadguru Swami Sri Bharati Krishna Tirthaji Maharaja in the middle 20th century which he claimed he had based on sutras he had found in an appendix of Atharvaveda, an ancient text of the Indian teachings known as the Vedas. He stated that these sutras only appeared in his personal copy of the appendix and not in the generally known appendices; his general editor noted that the style of language of the sutras "point to their discovery by Shri Swamiji himself".

"Vedic Mathematics" is the name given to the ancient system of mathematics, or, to be precise, a unique technique of calculations based on simple rules and principles, with which any mathematical problem — be it arithmetic, algebra, geometry or trigonometry — can be solved, *hold your breath*, orally!

A simple & Easy System

Practitioners of this striking method of mathematical problem-solving opine that Vedic maths is far more systematic, coherent and unified than the conventional system. It is a mental tool for calculation that encourages the development and use of intuition and innovation, while giving the student a lot of flexibility, fun and satisfaction. Therefore, it's direct and easy to implement in schools — a reason behind its enormous popularity among educationists and academicians.

In the Vedic system 'difficult' problems or huge sums can often be solved immediately by the Vedic method. These striking and beautiful methods are just a part of a complete system of mathematics which is far more systematic than the modern 'system'. Vedic Mathematics manifests the coherent and unified structure of mathematics and the methods are complementary, direct and easy.

The real beauty and effectiveness of Vedic Mathematics cannot be fully appreciated without actually practicing the system.

**BY Using VERTICALLY AND CROSSWISE technic , you do not need to know the** **multiplication tables beyond 5 X 5.**** For this technic you need to use 10 as a Base NO**

8

7 - 3

-------

5 6

**You subtract crosswise 8 - 3 or 7 - 2 and you get5 ,the first figure of the answer. And you multiply vertically: 2 x 3 to get 6, the last figure of the answer.**

That's all you do:

**See how far the numbers are below 10, subtract one number's deficiency from the other number, and multiply the deficiencies together.**

**How to do if has carry froward value? Let take a look on below example:**

7 x 6 = 42

7** - 36 - 4-------4 2**

In just FIVE minutes you should learn to quickly multiply up to 20x20 in your head

With this trick, you will be able to multiply any two numbers from 11 to 19 in your head quickly, without the use of a calculator.

I will assume that you know your multiplication table reasonably well up to 10x10.

Lets Try this:

Take 15 x 13 for an example.

Always place the larger number of the two on top in your mind.

First add 15 + 3 = 18

First add 15 + 3 = 18

Add a zero behind it (multiply by 10) to get 180. Multiply the covered lower 3 x the single digit above it the " 5"

( 3 x 5 = 15 ) Add 180 + 15 = 195.

Multiply any two Digits numbers From 11 To 19...using

Vertically & Crosswise

### To multiply any 2 - figure number by 11 less than 5 sec..

( 3 x 5 = 15 ) Add 180 + 15 = 195.

Multiply any two Digits numbers From 11 To 19...using

Vertically & Crosswise

An elegant way of multiplying numbers using a simple pattern.

21 x 23 = __483__

This is normally called long multiplication but actually the answer can be written straight down using the

VERTICALLY AND CROSSWISE formula.

We first put, or imagine, 23 below 21:

There is 3 steps:

a) Multiply vertically on the left: 2 x 2 = 4.

This gives the first figure of the answer.

b) Multiply crosswise and add: 2 x 3 + 1 x 2 = 8

This gives the middle figure.

c) Multiply vertically on the right: 1 x 3 = 3

This gives the last figure of the answer.

*And thats all there is to it.*

Similarly 61 x 31 = __1891__

6 x 3 = **18**; 6 x 1 + 1 x 3 = **9**; 1 x 1 = **1**

** **

**Let see how fast it is ...**

**Just put the total of the two figures between the 2 figures.**

**26**** x 11 = 286**

**Notice that the outer figures in 286 are the 26 being multiplied. And the middle figure is just 2 and 6 added up**

** ( 2 + 6 = 8 ) put at the center**

Split 7 & 2 like this __7 2__

Add up 7 & 2 ( 7 + 2 = 9 )

and put 9 at the center

7 __9 ____2__

**For more than two digits: Keep the extreme digits on their respective extreme sides,then pair off digits starting from the left and add pairs from the right keeping the answer in their respective positions, carrying over if required.**